Financial history THE FISHMONGERS' AND POULTERERS' INSTITUTION

Charity number: 209013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £32.85k £21.18k £21.00k £19.48k £23.35k
Total expenditure £31.77k £29.76k £26.28k £26.75k £25.83k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A