Accounts and annual returns KINGS HALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 209107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 March 2022 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 March 2022 406 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required