Financial history KINGS HALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 209107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £22.41k £16.93k £16.19k £18.65k £2.98k
Total expenditure £19.88k £25.86k £27.96k £40.64k £10.80k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A