Financial history THE STRANGERS REST MISSION

Charity number: 209117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £27.30k £68.64k £39.84k £71.68k £28.21k
Total expenditure £47.60k £48.54k £66.52k £103.83k £36.41k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A