NATIONAL LIBERAL CLUB BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 209121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £5.97k £6.46k £8.48k £5.54k £9.73k
Total expenditure £4.40k £4.38k £5.51k £5.97k £25.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A