THE BRITISH COUNCIL

Charity number: 209131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fiona Salzen Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Richard Mark Hookway Trustee 12 October 2021 None on record
CLARE REDDINGTON Trustee 01 May 2019
WISE CHILDREN LIMITED Received: On time
Sushil Kumar Saluja Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
Yasmin Diamond CB Trustee 11 July 2017
SUSTAINABLE HOSPITALITY ALLIANCE Received: On time
Rageh Omaar Trustee 23 September 2020
THE ROYAL UNITED SERVICES INSTITUTE FOR DEFENCE AND SECURITY STUDIES Received: On time
Dr Stephen John Deuchar CBE Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Dame Seona Elizabeth Reid DBE Trustee 11 June 2021 None on record
Thomas Drew CMG Trustee 13 February 2020 None on record
MARK PETER BEDDY Trustee 07 October 2018 None on record
Stephanie Spring Chair 14 August 2019
MIND (THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH) Received: On time
Professor Malcolm Colin Press Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
JANIS RACHEL LOMAX Trustee 03 December 2018
THE DITCHLEY FOUNDATION Received: On time
Dr David John Lefevre Trustee 12 October 2021 None on record