THE LODDON TOWN ESTATE

Charity number: 209135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.17k £11.48k £806 £1.80k £17.27k
Total expenditure £142 £492 £3.06k £863 £223
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A