ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS MEDWAY WEST BRANCH

Charity number: 209192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 July 2017 On time Download