DR RADCLIFFE'S TRUST

Charity number: 209212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TIMOTHY HUGH WILSON Trustee 02 January 2013 None on record
Margaret Casely-Hayford Trustee 01 December 2016
THE SHAKESPEARE GLOBE TRUST Received: On time
THE HONOURABLE FELIX GEOFFREY WARNOCK Trustee None on record
Melanie Howse Trustee 07 June 2018 None on record
ELLEN CHARLOTTE SCHRODER Trustee 28 November 2013 None on record
RICHARD DUNCAN MORRISON Trustee 28 November 2013
THE JOANINHA TRUST Received: On time
SIR CHRISTOPHER JOHN BUTCHER Chair None on record
Countess Elizabeth Howe Trustee 23 June 2021
FAUST CHAMBER ORCHESTRA Received: On time
David Whelton Trustee 28 November 2019
AMSCORDI LIMITED Received: On time
THE PHILHARMONIA ORCHESTRA IN BEDFORD TRUST Received: On time
THE MAYFIELD VALLEY ARTS TRUST Received: On time
THE GARRICK CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time