Accounts and annual returns PENSION TRUST FOR CHRISTIAN SCIENCE NURSES

Charity number: 209226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 30 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 30 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 08 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 08 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 12 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 11 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 11 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 22 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 22 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window