Financial history PENSION TRUST FOR CHRISTIAN SCIENCE NURSES

Charity number: 209226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £65.56k £175.71k £280.92k £90.40k £210.09k
Total expenditure £100.56k £91.63k £122.85k £151.56k £119.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A