Governance HAWTHORNE TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 209230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 02 October 1968: Standard registration
- 10 March 2020: Funds received from 1163453 CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY, EASTBOURNE
- 15 September 2021: Funds received from 1027429 FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST SCIENTIST TUNBRIDGE WELLS
- 11 January 2023: Funds received from 259407 TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH CHRISTIAN S...
- 17 April 2023: Funds received from 1054469 THE J L BRISLEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- CHARTON MANOR (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
- Care Quality Commission
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.