VARIETY THE CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 209259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.63m £6.97m £7.55m £7.66m £3.67m
Total expenditure £7.53m £6.95m £7.75m £7.41m £3.82m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.90m £4.60m £5.08m £5.38m £3.18m
Income - Other trading activities £2.66m £2.29m £2.39m £2.18m £386.34k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £82.24k £83.43k £88.36k £99.54k £102.02k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £201.15k £410.85k £214.70k £70.94k £347.87k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.84m £3.36m £4.43m £4.54m £2.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.69m £3.59m £3.32m £2.87m £1.49m
Expenditure - Governance £169.61k £196.81k £131.65k £168.45k £256.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.20m £2.07m £3.26m £615.67k £1.45m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0