Trustees VARIETY THE CHILDREN'S CHARITY
Charity number: 209259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tania Bryer | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Talya Shalson | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Candice Sammeroff | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Thomas Whittle | Trustee | 11 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Guy Remond | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tesula Mohindra | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dilaram Kitchlew-Williamson | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tushar Prabhu | Trustee | 19 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JONATHAN SHALIT OBE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.