Trustees THE FRANCIS BACON SOCIETY INCORPORATED

Charity number: 209426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SusanJane McIlroy Chair 24 October 2012
None on record
Edi Bilimoria Trustee 10 January 2020
THE SCIENTIFIC AND MEDICAL NETWORK
Received: On time
THE SCIENTIFIC AND MEDICAL NETWORK CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Edmund Nicholas Young Trustee 26 July 2019
None on record
Joan Elizabeth Fraser Trustee 08 June 2018
STAR ACTION
Received: On time
BRIONY RAWLE Trustee 20 April 2016
None on record
KAREN LENNON Trustee 17 February 2016
THE RESEARCH INTO LOST KNOWLEDGE ORGANISATION TRUST
Received: On time
SUSAN JANE MCILROY Trustee 24 October 2012
None on record
SYLVIA EZEN Trustee 29 October 2011
THE RESEARCH INTO LOST KNOWLEDGE ORGANISATION TRUST
Received: On time