Accounts and annual returns THE RON HANCOCK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 209526
Charity reporting is overdue by 44 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 44 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 21 February 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required