THE LEICESTER HEBREW CONGREGATIONAL RELIEF FUND

Charity number: 209557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 05 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 13 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 10 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required