Accounts and annual returns THE UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 209568
Charity reporting is overdue by 244 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 244 days
Accounts and TAR 22 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 244 days
Annual return 22 January 2022 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 22 January 2021 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 22 January 2020 09 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 22 January 2019 09 March 2020 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 January 2019 Not Required