Financial history THE UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 209568
Charity reporting is overdue by 238 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 22/01/2018 22/01/2019 22/01/2020 22/01/2021 22/01/2022
Total gross income £8.67k £5.59k £5.88k £4.73k £5.24k
Total expenditure £4.80k £4.63k £5.79k £4.82k £4.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A