Financial history THE ROYAL NATIONAL LIFEBOAT INSTITUTION

Charity number: 209603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £197.69m £202.35m £192.21m £197.21m £199.17m
Total expenditure £183.20m £181.96m £192.06m £197.80m £172.55m
Income from government contracts £3.31m £3.74m £3.78m £3.38m £2.39m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.88m
Income - Donations and legacies £181.82m £184.71m £174.01m £178.94m £178.71m
Income - Other trading activities £8.96m £10.66m £11.01m £11.48m £8.26m
Income - Charitable activities £3.60m £3.74m £3.83m £3.94m £2.63m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £328.00k
Income - Investment £2.28m £2.18m £2.36m £2.18m £1.60m
Income - Other £1.04m £1.07m £1.01m £672.00k £7.98m
Income - Legacies £130.46m £135.10m £122.49m £126.54m £131.58m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £146.06m £149.31m £157.21m £165.52m £143.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds £37.15m £27.47m £34.85m £32.28m £28.94m
Expenditure - Governance £361.88k £451.01k £475.00k £469.00k £419.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £450.47k £849.03k £956.00k £1.13m £879.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £459.93k £309.27k £525.00k £493.00k £493.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £5.18m £0 £0 £0