Governance THE ROYAL NATIONAL LIFEBOAT INSTITUTION

Charity number: 209603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 27 March 1963: Standard registration
  • 21 February 2014: Funds received from 1109939 THE DEREK AND JEAN DODD CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 24 July 2019: Funds received from 1148859 FRIENDS OF CLEETHORPES HERITAGE
  • 22 July 2020: Funds received from 327829 THE JUNE STEVENS FOUNDATION
  • 09 February 2021: Funds received from 327270 THE OLIVE HERBERT CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LIFEBOATS (Working name)
  • RNLI (Working name)
  • ROYAL NATIONAL LIFEBOAT INSTITUTION FOR THE PRESERVATION OF LIFE FROM SHIPWRECK (Previous name)
  • ROYAL NATIONAL LIFE-BOAT INSTITUTION FOR THE PRESERVATION OF LIFE FROM SHIPWRECK (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property