Trustees THE ROYAL NATIONAL LIFEBOAT INSTITUTION

Charity number: 209603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STUART POPHAM Chair 30 July 2015
CHICHESTER HARBOUR TRUST
Received: On time
Mark Gregory Wordsworth Trustee 15 April 2021
RNLI LIFESAVING ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
Dr John James Killeen Trustee 05 November 2020
None on record
Fiona Catherine Fell Trustee 05 November 2020
None on record
Paddy McLaughlin Trustee 05 November 2020
None on record
Denis Woulfe MBE Trustee 17 July 2019
None on record
Dr Philip Goodwin Trustee 19 July 2018
None on record
Rear Admiral Roger Lockwood CB Trustee 21 February 2018
None on record
Mike Sturrock Trustee 16 November 2016
None on record
Sonia Modray Trustee 25 November 2015
None on record
Eddie Donaldson Trustee 30 July 2015
None on record
Janet Cooper Trustee 30 July 2015
None on record
Chris Walters MEng Trustee 30 July 2015
None on record
SIR Peter Housden KCB Trustee 30 July 2015
None on record