THE GUIDE DOGS FOR THE BLIND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 209617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 08 November 1962: Standard registration
  • 16 July 2015: Funds received from 222632 PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH THE COLNE BLIND P...
  • 25 November 2015: Funds received from 506403 STOKE-ON-TRENT, NEWCASTLE AND DISTRICT TALKING NEW...
  • 25 May 2016: Funds received from 1078181 THE MONDAY CLUB FOR THE BLIND
  • 18 July 2018: Funds received from 1040914 THE BURTON BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED CLUB
  • 18 July 2018: Funds received from 1040914 THE BURTON BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED CLUB
  • 14 November 2018: Funds received from 216119 LINCOLN VEGA CLUB FOR THE BLIND
  • 15 May 2019: Funds received from 505111 OGWR DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION
  • 15 May 2019: Funds received from 505111 OGWR DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION
  • 12 September 2019: Funds received from 1119972 DISABLED HOLIDAY INFORMATION
  • 13 December 2019: Funds received from 277073 HERTFORD AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER
  • 22 July 2020: Funds received from 327829 THE JUNE STEVENS FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • GDBA (Working name)
  • GUIDE DOGS (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property