THE GUIDE DOGS FOR THE BLIND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 209617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
POLLY WILLIAMS Trustee 08 May 2014 None on record
CLARE ELIZABETH BLACK Trustee 30 July 2013
BLIND CHILDREN UK Received: On time
Jennelle Lisa Tilling Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
Mark Alexander Talbot Johnstone Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
RANJIT SONDHI Trustee 06 June 2018
CITIZENS UK CHARITY Received: On time
PMA FOUNDATION Received: On time
SOUTH ASIAN DIASPORA LITERATURES AND ARTS ARCHIVE (SALIDAA) Received: On time
HOPE PROJECTS (WEST MIDLANDS) LTD Received: On time
THE COLE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
NISHKAM HEALTHCARE TRUST Received: On time
SAMPAD (SOUTH ASIAN ARTS DEVELOPMENT) Received: On time
Michael John Wroe Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
ROB DEAKIN Trustee 06 June 2018 None on record
Lynne Victoria Hill Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
Emma Jane West Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
Paul William Baker Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
Kate Crofts Trustee 06 June 2018 None on record
JAMES DARYL HAMBRO Chair 06 October 2015
THE J AND D HAMBRO CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time