ROYAL ASIATIC SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity number: 209629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 August 2017 On time Download