Dogfen lywodraethu IMPERIAL CANCER RESEARCH FUND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 29/08/1939 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 04/10/1951 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 03/04/1958 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 26/02/1964 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 12/12/1978 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 21/09/1988 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 18/07/2001 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 11/11/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION TREATMENT AND CURE OF CANCER IN OUR UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE INCLUDING ASSISTANCE IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF FINDINGS OF RESEARCH INTO PRACTICAL APPLICATIONS FOR THE PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF CANCER.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.