Financial history BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSALEM

Charity number: 209691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £7.48m £9.18m £10.00m £9.81m £8.34m
Total expenditure £7.41m £10.05m £9.02m £9.51m £8.60m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.89m £8.54m £9.27m £9.18m £7.82m
Income - Other trading activities £63.88k £24.33k £68.29k £22.83k £18.72k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £195.50k £189.88k £474.80k £551.60k £1.17m
Income - Investment £529.39k £616.64k £656.86k £601.42k £506.01k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £864.75k £889.05k £1.87m £1.92m £1.26m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.55m £9.61m £8.60m £9.08m £8.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £307.71k £437.74k £394.33k £426.29k £602.99k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £27.06k £21.74k £25.18k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £7.55m £9.58m £8.36m £8.84m £7.76m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £98.41k £0 £0 £173.81k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £23.82k £0 £0