THE TAVISTOCK INSTITUTE OF HUMAN RELATIONS

Charity number: 209706
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 August 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 10 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 16 October 2019 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 04 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 23 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 18 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 30 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 08 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 28 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 01 February 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)