Financial history THE TAVISTOCK INSTITUTE OF HUMAN RELATIONS

Charity number: 209706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £2.37m £2.46m £2.89m £2.55m £2.69m
Total expenditure £2.41m £2.41m £2.67m £2.42m £2.44m
Income from government contracts £200.00k £124.00k £513.27k £602.42k £181.20k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £4.43k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £11.45k £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.37m £2.46m £2.88m £2.44m £2.63m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.04k £0 £1.85k £2.42k £369
Income - Other £198 £1.15k £195 £84.65k £55.60k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.41m £2.41m £2.67m £2.42m £2.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0