THE TAVISTOCK INSTITUTE OF HUMAN RELATIONS

Charity number: 209706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Philip James Trustee 22 July 2020 None on record
LUCIAN HUDSON Trustee 14 July 2021 None on record
Katharina Mueller Trustee 22 July 2020 None on record
Dr ELIAT ARAM Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
Dr Martin Powell Trustee 22 July 2020 None on record
Viktorija Smatko-Abaza Trustee 22 January 2020 None on record
Grant Taylor Trustee 22 March 2019 None on record
steve Hearsum Trustee 01 October 2021 None on record
Stella Okeahialam Trustee 13 March 2019 None on record