Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF LORD MAYNARD FOR PARISH CLERK

Charity number: 209943
Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 328 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 328 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 February 2020 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 December 2018 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 October 2018 353 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required