Financial history CHARITY OF LORD MAYNARD FOR PARISH CLERK

Charity number: 209943
Charity reporting is overdue by 338 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £236 £204 £122 £216 £326
Total expenditure £236 £204 £122 £216 £326
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A