Financial history THE CHURCH WELFARE ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED)

Charity number: 209992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £45.57k £44.93k £46.08k £39.16k £44.00k
Total expenditure £45.43k £48.41k £88.72k £55.05k £94.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A