Financial history THE MACDONALD-BUCHANAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 209994
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £165.02k £138.87k £158.66k £117.21k £144.01k
Total expenditure £188.67k £130.47k £195.05k £99.80k £131.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A