Trustees THE JOSEPH ROWNTREE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 210037

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN FITZGERALD | Chair | 09 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marghuerita Remi-Judah | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Hannah Elizabeth Darton | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANET SLADE | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
|||||
DAVID NEWTON | Trustee | 09 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
HUW GWYNFOR DAVIES | Trustee | 09 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MARGARET BATTEN | Trustee | 06 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER AMERY | Trustee | 06 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Torkington | Trustee | 18 November 2011 |
|
|||||
HELEN JANET CARMICHAEL | Trustee | 10 September 2004 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.