WYE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 210070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £30.79k £32.42k £36.32k £35.58k £37.23k
Total expenditure £28.11k £38.59k £34.58k £26.02k £28.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A