WYE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 210070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JULIE LOUISE DOD Trustee 10 January 2017 None on record
MICHAEL WILLIAM CURTIS Trustee 02 March 2002
SCHOOL FOUNDATION Received: On time
RUTH ELIZABETH JUDGE Trustee 17 October 2016
WYE VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY Received: On time
LYNETTE SUSAN APPS Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR NICOLAS JOHN RUSSELL Trustee 15 June 2017
THE WYE AND BROOK INDIA TRUST Received: On time
THE ASSOCIATION OF THE FRIENDS OF ST. GREGORY AND ST. MARTIN AT WYE Received: On time
Dr TERENCE JOHN DONOVAN Trustee 08 August 2012
WYE VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY Received: On time