CUSTOM WOOD OR FUEL CHARITY

Charity number: 210081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 April 2019 168 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required