THE ROYAL STAR & GARTER HOMES

Charity number: 210119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Carolyn Jane Eastwood Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
CHRISTOPHER HARRISON Trustee 16 June 2015 None on record
William Andrew Reid Trustee 21 March 2017
SEAFARERS UK (KING GEORGE'S FUND FOR SAILORS) Received: On time
Brigadier Alison McCourt Trustee 21 March 2017 None on record
DIGBY FLOWER Trustee 14 June 2016 None on record
Edward Goodchild Trustee 20 June 2018 None on record
AMANDA FRANCIS Trustee 17 June 2014 None on record
Amanda Rose Nicholson Trustee 01 September 2020
CHARITY OF JANE BUSBY Received: On time
THE UNIVERSITY OF BUCKINGHAM FOUNDATION
CHARITY OF ANN TYNTE Received: On time
THE E M MACANDREW TRUST Received: On time
Maria Byford Trustee 20 March 2018
RAF SPORTS FEDERATION Received: On time
Dr David Richard Staples Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
AIR VICE-MARSHAL SIMON DOUGHERTY Trustee 16 June 2015
ALBERT MEMORIAL COLLEGE Received: On time
JULIE THAIN-SMITH Trustee 16 June 2015 None on record
Major General Timothy Nicholas Tyler Chair 17 June 2014 None on record
Susan J Bush Trustee 17 June 2014 None on record
MARK WILLS Trustee 17 June 2014 None on record