THE NORMANSFIELD AND RICHMOND FOUNDATION

Charity number: 210144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £47.51k £49.68k £53.78k £50.40k £58.63k
Total expenditure £47.35k £50.14k £50.73k £54.06k £19.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A