LLOYD'S PATRIOTIC FUND

Charity number: 210173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil Maidment Trustee 25 February 2020 None on record
Caroline Sandeman-Allen Trustee 23 October 2019 None on record
RICHARD WILLIAMS Trustee 25 November 2014 None on record
Air Commodore Wendy Rothery Trustee 14 June 2016 None on record
Edward Butler Chair 30 January 2019 None on record
BRUCE CARNEGIE-BROWN Trustee 28 June 2017
CHARTERED MANAGEMENT INSTITUTE Received: On time
Alexander Findlay Trustee 11 March 2014 None on record
Michelle Alston Trustee 23 October 2019 None on record
Duncan Welham Trustee 28 June 2017 None on record
William Roscoe Trustee 15 November 2016 None on record