Accounts and annual returns LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE QUEEN ELIZABETH THE QUEEN MOTHER HOSPITAL

Charity number: 210234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window