Financial history LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE QUEEN ELIZABETH THE QUEEN MOTHER HOSPITAL

Charity number: 210234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £252.48k £117.12k £112.32k £100.44k £102.73k
Total expenditure £168.01k £126.03k £156.89k £106.74k £132.61k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A