Accounts and annual returns THE INSTITUTION OF CIVIL ENGINEERS

Charity number: 210252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window