CLERKENWELL CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 210271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £29.41k £14.58k £20.19k £35.22k £16.03k
Total expenditure £41.56k £11.56k £25.51k £18.45k £31.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £2.22k £2.42k