CLERKENWELL CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 210271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JOHN CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM ROSSER Chair 04 January 2006
J & M ROSSER EVANGELICAL TRUST Received: On time
Dorcas Andam Trustee 01 November 2018 None on record
Kaj O'Sullivan Trustee 29 April 2015 None on record
MARY ROSSER Trustee 01 April 2007 None on record
Anita Tennent Trustee 26 September 2014 None on record
Donna Drion Trustee 26 September 2014 None on record
TOM DRION Trustee 18 January 2011
GRACELIFE LONDON Received: On time
Aaron Clark Trustee 26 April 2017 None on record