Financial history THE EARL OF NORTHAMPTON'S CHARITY

Charity number: 210291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.03m £1.06m £1.26m £1.31m £1.14m
Total expenditure £698.00k £701.00k £872.00k £1.24m £1.70m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £11.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £391.00k £399.00k £513.00k £509.00k £526.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £635.00k £657.00k £746.00k £796.00k £604.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £633.00k £623.00k £808.00k £1.18m £1.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £65.00k £78.00k £64.00k £66.00k £64.00k
Expenditure - Governance £19.00k £20.00k £23.00k £13.00k £23.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £10.00k £10.00k £43.00k £339.00k £659.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £65.00k £78.00k £64.00k £65.00k £64.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0