CHARITY OF WALTER JEFFRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Benefit of boys under the care of the Ipswich board of Guardians in St. John's Home
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Suffolk
Governance
- 29 May 1963: Standard registration
- 30 September 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67 | £88 | £91 | £87 | £107 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 11 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 05 March 2008 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 13 February 2007 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 06 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 23RD DECEMBER 1927 V UNREP VOL 237 AT P 454
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF BOYS FOR THE TIME BEING UNDER THE CARE OF THE IPSWICH BOARD OF GUARDIANS IN ST. JOHN'S HOME.
Area of benefit
IPSWICH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window