ROCKLAND ST MARY FUEL ALLOTMENT

Charity number: 210399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required