Trustees CITY OF LIVERPOOL YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION (INC)
Charity number: 210443

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mike Barker | Chair | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Klepper | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Farran | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare White | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ROUSE | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Michelle Montrose | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Spowart | Trustee | 28 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Price | Trustee | 28 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr SIMON ABRAMS | Trustee | 28 March 2015 |
|
|||||
MS WINNIE LAWLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY COMPTON RICKETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.